LONDON GOSPEL PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1201824
Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We promote partnership between gospel churches, across all denominations and networks, to reach London for Christ. As well as wanting to work together at a local level, we run several events each year: a one-day annual conference to equip church leadership teams, a residential conference to equip preachers and an afternoon to gather together to pray for London.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £19,352
Total expenditure: £20,825

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 February 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • LGP (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Richard Bray Chair 03 February 2023
SAMUEL BUTLER'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANNE'S, LIMEHOUSE
Received: 18 days late
CARE FOR LIMEHOUSE PARISH CHURCH (ST ANNE'S) COMMERCIAL ROAD TRUST (USUALLY KNOWN AS CARE FOR ST ANNE'S)
Received: On time
Rev Corinne Jayne Brixton Trustee 28 February 2025
None on record
Rev David Alexander Lee Trustee 28 February 2025
None on record
TIMOTHY JOHN MANSON Trustee 03 February 2023
GUNNERSBURY BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: 14 days late
KERYGMA 180
Received: On time
Rev Jason ONeale Roach Trustee 03 February 2023
None on record
Rev JAMES JOHN CHILD Trustee 03 February 2023
CROSSWAY STRATFORD
Received: On time
BRIAN WILLIAM O'DONOGHUE Trustee 03 February 2023
ELTHAM COLLEGE
Received: On time
THE SOLA TRUST
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
GOSPEL PARTNERS TRUST
Received: On time
Gospel Support and Homes Trust Limited
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2024
Total gross income £19.35k
Total expenditure £20.83k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 18 March 2025 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 18 March 2025 41 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
c/o Limehouse Rectory
5 NEWELL STREET
LONDON
E14 7HP
Phone:
02079871502