INFO LATINOS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
What - General charitable purposes, economic/community development/employment, other charitable purposes Who - General Public/mankind How - Provides services Where - England and Wales
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 March 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IVONNE CANTU | Chair | 24 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Maria Ernestina Ferrey Maturana | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Martin | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nancy Caroline Rivera Connor | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION OF PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY LATIN AMERICANS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR IMMIGRATION STATUS AND SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION. THIS MAY INCLUDE PROVIDING AN INTER-CULTURAL BUDDYING SCHEME, OPPORTUNITIES TO BUILD CONNECTIONS AND RELATIONSHIPS WITH UK RESIDENTS AND CITIZENS TO BUILD SELF-WORTH, CONFIDENCE, ENGLISH LANGUAGE AND EMPLOYABILITY SKILLS AND PROMOTE CULTURAL DIVERSITY IN COMMUNITIES IN THE UK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Info Latinos
PO Box 81205
LONDON
E3 9HB
- Phone:
- 07861680150
- Email:
- infolatinosuk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window