LEAVENING ALLOTMENTS & GARDENS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of allotments and community garden for benefit of the residents of Leavening
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £18,909 from 3 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 17 February 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Ann Hampson | Chair | 18 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Susan Carter-Ferris | Trustee | 24 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kelvin John Dudfield Hughes | Trustee | 18 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen McDermott | Trustee | 18 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £18.91k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE RESIDENTS OF LEAVENING WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS, OR OTHER OPINIONS BY PROVIDING ALLOTMENT FACILITIES, COMMUNAL GARDENING SPACE AND PROMOTING SUSTAINABLE GROWING PRACTICES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATIONAL LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
MADEIRA HOUSE
YORK ROAD
LEAVENING
NORTH YORKSHIRE
YO17 9SN
YO17 9SN
- Phone:
- 07540721931
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window