CANVEY KEHILLA LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community work
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£992,868
Donations and legacies | £919.11k | |
Charitable activities | £73.76k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£993,249
Raising funds | £95.63k | |
Charitable activities | £793.38k | |
Other | £104.24k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £199.87k | |
Charitable expenditure | £793.38k |
People

5 Employee(s)
3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 17 February 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mike Gold | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yidele Herzka | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Simche Hillel Elias | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £992.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £993.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £919.11k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £73.76k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £793.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £95.63k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.21k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £6.85k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £104.24k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £419 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £156.54k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £131.43k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 JUN 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 FEB 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN CANVEY ISLAND, ESSEX IN SUCH WAYS AS ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO SYNAGOGUES IN WHICH PRAYER SERVICES ARE HELD AND RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS AND LIFE CYCLE EVENTS ARE CELEBRATED; (B) PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT ALL AND ANY FACILITIES AND SERVICES AS MAY BE NECESSARY IN ORDER TO FACILITATE AND ASSIST THE COMMUNAL AND INDIVIDUAL PRACTICE OF ORTHODOX JUDAISM; (C) PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT AND ASSIST EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS, EVENTS AND PROGRAMMES WHICH EDUCATE THE ORTHODOX JEWISH COMMUNITY, THE WIDER JEWISH COMMUNITY AND MEMBERS OF GENERAL PUBLIC ON THE TEACHINGS AND PRACTICES OF ORTHODOX JUDAISM.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 JASMINE CLOSE
CANVEY ISLAND
SS8 0HT
- Phone:
- 07833087562
- Email:
- office@canveykehilla.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window