Financial history VILLAGE HALL TITLEY

Charity number: 520988
Charity reporting is up to date (85 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.54k £20.32k £16.08k £9.02k £14.62k
Total expenditure £5.96k £5.45k £9.28k £10.19k £12.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.43k £10.67k N/A N/A