THE SMITH MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
village hall used by numerous groups for different activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 28 October 1965: Standard registration
- WITHINGTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Michael Fretten | Chair | 11 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Howard Malcolm Avison Mansell | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Colin Arthur Hunt | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bob Wood | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN R HEWISON | Trustee | 01 October 1999 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.56k | £38.76k | £21.14k | £19.92k | £21.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.33k | £24.83k | £10.96k | £16.56k | £16.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.80k | £16.43k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 17 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 26 AUGUST 1965
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
WITHINGTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Withington Village Hall
Coppice Close
Withington
HEREFORD
HR1 3PP
- Phone:
- 07362 783641
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window