WOOLHOPE NATURALISTS FIELD CLUB

Charity number: 521000
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Eight meetings and eight field meetings were held during the year. The Committee met four times during the year Newsletters were published in March and September The annual Transactions was published in December.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £12,125
Total expenditure: £11,345

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Herefordshire
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 May 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JONATHAN COMBER Trustee 16 March 2024
THE HEREFORDSHIRE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY TRUST
Received: On time
THE WOOLHOPE NATURALISTS’ FIELD CLUB OF HEREFORDSHIRE
Recently registered
Joseph Goldsmith Trustee 16 March 2024
THE WOOLHOPE NATURALISTS’ FIELD CLUB OF HEREFORDSHIRE
Recently registered
Toby Cusworth Trustee 16 March 2024
THE WOOLHOPE NATURALISTS’ FIELD CLUB OF HEREFORDSHIRE
Recently registered
Christian Montez Trustee 15 March 2024
THE WOOLHOPE NATURALISTS’ FIELD CLUB OF HEREFORDSHIRE
Recently registered
Dr HOWARD CHARLES TOMLINSON PhD Trustee 31 March 2023
THE WOOLHOPE NATURALISTS’ FIELD CLUB OF HEREFORDSHIRE
Recently registered
William Robert Colcough Watson Trustee 12 March 2023
None on record
Dr Keith RAY PhD Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Duncan JAMES Trustee 01 December 2021
THE PEMBRIDGE AMENITY TRUST
Charity reporting is overdue by 103 days
THE WOOLHOPE NATURALISTS’ FIELD CLUB OF HEREFORDSHIRE
Recently registered
Anne Harbour Trustee 14 March 2021
THE WOOLHOPE NATURALISTS’ FIELD CLUB OF HEREFORDSHIRE
Recently registered
Terry Morgan Trustee 04 March 2021
THE WOOLHOPE NATURALISTS’ FIELD CLUB OF HEREFORDSHIRE
Recently registered
SUSAN OLVER BSc Trustee 01 January 2017
THE WOOLHOPE NATURALISTS’ FIELD CLUB OF HEREFORDSHIRE
Recently registered
PROFESSOR RACHEL JENKINS Trustee 01 January 2017
THE WOOLHOPE NATURALISTS’ FIELD CLUB OF HEREFORDSHIRE
Recently registered
Dr JANE MCKENZIE ADAMS Trustee 01 January 2017
HEREFORDSHIRE MUSEUM SERVICE SUPPORT GROUP
Received: On time
THE WOOLHOPE NATURALISTS’ FIELD CLUB OF HEREFORDSHIRE
Recently registered
Marianne Percival Trustee 14 June 2013
THE WOOLHOPE NATURALISTS’ FIELD CLUB OF HEREFORDSHIRE
Recently registered
CONINGSBY'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
MOIRA JENKINS BSC Trustee 18 May 2011
THE WOOLHOPE NATURALISTS’ FIELD CLUB OF HEREFORDSHIRE
Recently registered
Dr JANET MARY COOPER MA Trustee 18 May 2011
THE WOOLHOPE NATURALISTS’ FIELD CLUB OF HEREFORDSHIRE
Recently registered
MR D LOVELACE Trustee
FRIENDS OF HEREFORDSHIRE ARCHIVES
Received: On time
THE WOOLHOPE NATURALISTS’ FIELD CLUB OF HEREFORDSHIRE
Recently registered
MR D A WHITEHEAD MA FSA Trustee
THE HEREFORDSHIRE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY TRUST
Received: On time
THE WOOLHOPE NATURALISTS’ FIELD CLUB OF HEREFORDSHIRE
Recently registered
DR JOHN CHRISTIAN EISEL PhD Trustee
THE WOOLHOPE NATURALISTS’ FIELD CLUB OF HEREFORDSHIRE
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11.63k £10.83k £9.86k £10.39k £12.13k
Total expenditure £15.91k £9.52k £8.57k £16.41k £11.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WOOLHOPE ROOM
HEREFORD LIBRARY
BROAD STREET
HEREFORD
HR4 9AU
Phone:
01684577134