THE SOCIETY OF YOGA PRACTITIONERS LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance good health and wellbeing among the public by providing Yoga activities and services in the tradition of Professor T Krishnamacharya and Sri TKV Desikachar and by advancing education and knowledge of those Yoga practices among Yoga practitioners and therapists to enable them to practice to high standards.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 07 November 2023: Standard registration
- TSYP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karin Ruth Worthy | Chair | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
RAE MILNE SMITH | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann Shanks | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Mary Saaler | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Katrina Jane Heather | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 DEC 2020 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19 OCT 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE GOOD HEALTH AND WELLBEING AMONG THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING YOGA ACTIVITIES AND SERVICES IN THE TRADITION OF PROFESSOR T KRISHNAMACHARYA AND SRI TKV DESIKACHAR, AND BY ADVANCING EDUCATION AND KNOWLEDGE OF THOSE YOGA PRACTICES AMONG YOGA PRACTITIONERS AND THERAPISTS TO ENABLE THEM TO PRACTICE TO HIGH STANDARDS. (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND KNOWLEDGE OF YOGA BY PROVIDING EVENTS, COURSES, TRAINING AND RESOURCES, AND BY SUPPORTING THE STUDY AND RESEARCH INTO YOGA METHODS AND OUTCOMES, AND TO ENSURE THE DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
124 CARLTON ROAD
REIGATE
RH2 0JF
- Phone:
- 07941572359
- Email:
- treasurer@tsyp.yoga
- Website:
-
WWW.TSYP.YOGA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.