THE ANNE DUTTON CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 31 July 2023: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Rachel Blanchflower | Trustee |
|
||||
Dr Charles Turner | Trustee |
|
||||
Rev Adrian Semerene | Trustee |
|
||||
Emily Brown | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 February 2025 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS: (1) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION IN GREAT GRANSDEN, CAMBRIDGESHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: (A) THE PROVISION OR SUPPORT OF PASTORAL, PRAYER AND/OR WORSHIP ACTIVITIES THROUGH COLLABORATION WITH MEMBER GROUPS OF CHURCHES TOGETHER IN ENGLAND OR NOT. (B) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, AS AN OUTWORKING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO) THE PROVISION OF A CHRISTIAN CAFE. (C)THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A BURIAL GROUND. (2) THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN PART 1 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR USE FOR THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY BUT CAN BE LEASED IN FURTHERANCE OF THE CHARITY?S OBJECT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 SAND ROAD
GREAT GRANSDEN
SANDY
SG19 3AQ
- Phone:
- 07775901855
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window