FRIENDS OF TUDOR PARK AND PAVILION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of recreation facilities and general activities to the community and wider public by way of renovating and refurbishing the Tudor Park Pavilion, Tudor Sports Ground, Barnet and the subsequent management of the site.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnet
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 23 January 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Jeremy Cohen | Chair | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Robert Hay | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Hannah Sophie Lawrence | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Kaufman | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NEW BARNET AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (“THE AREA OF BENEFIT”) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION (IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE REFURBISHMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF THE TUDOR PARK PAVILION) FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Hillary Rise
Barnet
EN5 5AZ
- Phone:
- 02084497779
- Email:
- treasurer@fotpp.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window