BLACKPOOL HERITAGE AND MUSEUM TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the education of the public in relation to the history of Blackpool by the operation, maintenance and preservation of a museum in Blackpool known as 'Showtown: the museum of fun and entertainment'. To promote the history and heritage of Blackpool and the maintenance and preservation of the Blackpool heritage collections.
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Blackpool
Governance
- 06 October 2023: Standard registration
- THE SHOWTOWN TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORD SPENCER JOHN PHILLIPS | Chair | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anita Cooper | Trustee | 26 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillan Campbell | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL JOHN ARTHUR PATTERSON | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN MARY BENSON | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 MAR 2022 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28 APR 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31 MAR 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:- 3.1 TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN RELATION TO THE HISTORY OF BLACKPOOL PRINCIPALLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: 3.1.1 THE OPERATION, MAINTENANCE AND PRESERVATION OF A MUSEUM IN BLACKPOOL KNOWN AS 'SHOWTOWN: THE MUSEUM OF FUN AND ENTERTAINMENT'; 3.1.2 THE OPERATION, MAINTENANCE AND PRESERVATION OF HERITAGE TRANSPORTATION; AND 3.1.3 THE DELIVERY OF ASSOCIATED FACILITIES AND ENGAGEMENT PROGRAMMES, FOSTERING KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING, APPRECIATION AND ENJOYMENT OF THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF BLACKPOOL AND THE MAINTENANCE AND PRESERVATION OF THE BLACKPOOL HERITAGE COLLECTIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHOWTOWN
PALATINE BUILDING
PROMENADE
BLACKPOOL
FY1 4TQ
- Phone:
- 01253478624
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.