CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF CHRIST AND THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY, ROCHESTER
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian religion in accordance with the faith and practice of the Church of England, in particular by furthering the mission of the Church of England. To care for and conserve the fabric and structure of the Cathedral Church building. To advance any other charitable purposes.
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bexley
- Bromley
- Kent
- Medway
Governance
- 06 February 2024: Standard registration
- ROCHESTER CATHEDRAL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Philip Hesketh DL | Chair | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Carline Deal | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID SAMUELS | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Colin Lovell | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Sue Brewer | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Chris Dench | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Francis | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev NEIL JOHN BUNKER | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Barbara Chinamasa | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
ELLEN COUZENS | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Paul David Hudson | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|||||||
Rev Gordon Giles PhD | Trustee | 13 June 2020 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JAN 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHAPTER ARE? (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FAITH AND PRACTICE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, IN PARTICULAR BY FURTHERING THE MISSION OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND; (B) TO CARE FOR AND CONSERVE THE FABRIC AND STRUCTURE OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH BUILDING; (C) TO ADVANCE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE ANCILLARY TO THE FURTHERANCE OF THE PURPOSE REFERRED TO IN SUB-PARAGRAPH (A) OR (B). THE CHAPTER MUST ACT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITHIN THE MEANING OF SECTION 4(3) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2011.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GARTH HOUSE
THE PRECINCT
ROCHESTER
ME1 1SX
- Phone:
- 01634843366
- Email:
- info@rochestercathedral.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.