CULLERCOATS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation, for the benefit of all inhabitants of Cullercoats and the surrounding areas, by the provision of facilities for playing association football.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
79 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Tyneside
Governance
- 06 April 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Scott Andrew Mason | Chair | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gaynor Carle | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Goodwin | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Craig Williamson | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev David WYND | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Julieanne Caie | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Shorting | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN CULLERCOATS AND SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF FOOTBALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CULLERCOATS FOOTBALL CLUB
59 WHITTINGHAM ROAD
NORTH SHIELDS
NE30 3TD
- Phone:
- 07354849658
- Email:
- contact@cullercoatsfc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window