NORTH STAFFS AND SOUTH CHESHIRE KIDNEY PATIENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity seeks to improve the lives of those who suffer with any and all aspects of chronic kidney disease and who are treated by or at the University Hospital of North Midlands Trust at locations in Stoke on Trent, County Hospital, Stafford and Leighton Hospital, Crewe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 13 February 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID KERBY | Chair | 26 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Lesley Ann Lloyd | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|||||
JUDITH MARY NEWCOMBE | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
NEIL JAMES GARBETT | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
EUNICE ELIZABETH FINNEY | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM KIDNEY DISEASE OR RENAL FAILURE BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND WHO ARE BEING TREATED BY THE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL OF NORTH MIDLANDS TRUST FROM, OR AT, LOCATIONS IN STOKE ON TRENT, STAFFORD AND CREWE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Avon Drive
Congleton
CW12 3RG
- Phone:
- 07790953305
- Email:
- contact@nssckpa.org
- Website:
-
nssckpa.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window