ST HELENS UNIT 294 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of training in seamanship, boatwork and marine engineering. The training in self discipline by emulation of the rules and traditions of the Royal Navy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
29 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- St Helens
Governance
- 09 December 1963: Standard registration
- T.S SCIMITAR (Working name)
- ST HELENS SEA CADETS UNIT TS SCIMITAR (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ronald Mahoney | Chair | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Malgorzata Barrow | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Terence Burns | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Dillon | Trustee | 03 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Chadwick | Trustee | 09 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Edward Richard William Stanley | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.71k | £8.56k | £41.68k | £32.00k | £31.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.40k | £14.51k | £22.09k | £39.83k | £30.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEA CADET REGULATIONS
Charitable objects
The charitable purpose of the Unit (the Purpose) is to promote the development of young people in achieving their physical, intellectual and social potential as individuals and as responsible citizens by the provision of education and leisure time activities using a nautical theme and in accordance with the principles, ethos and practices of the Marine Society & Sea Cadets (MSSC).
Area of benefit
ST HELENS AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
T S Scimitar
St. Helens Sea Cadet Corp
Mill Street
ST. HELENS
WA10 2BB
- Phone:
- 0174420193
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window