ST PAUL'S CATHEDRAL

Charity number: 1206171
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

St Paul's Cathedral is the Anglican Cathedral Church of the Diocese of London offering daily worship, and a focus for spirituality, prayer, learning and outreach. It is the seat of the Bishop of London and the mother church of the Diocese. The Cathedral is also a historical monument, built by Sir Christopher Wren to the glory of God, which welcomes hundreds of thousands of visitors every year.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 December 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE CORPORATION OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF ST PAUL IN LONDON (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Very Revd Andrew Tremlett Chair 20 September 2022
ST PAUL'S CATHEDRAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Rev Philip Charles Banks Trustee 05 October 2024
THE ST PAUL'S CATHEDRAL CHORISTER TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Catherine Okoronkwo Trustee 08 September 2024
None on record
Dr Paula Gooder Trustee 07 December 2023
THE CHOIR CHURCH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Peter Michael Aiers OBE Trustee 12 October 2023
The Reverend Dr George Richards Charity for Poor Clergy
Received: On time
MCCULLAGH MERVYN MR Trustee 12 October 2023
None on record
MORAG ELLIS MISS Trustee 12 October 2023
None on record
Alison Jane Gowman Trustee 12 October 2023
THE BEACON FELLOWSHIP CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
GILLIAN BOWEN Trustee 05 June 2022
JUST LIKE US
Received: On time
Clement Hutton-Mills Trustee 15 March 2021
None on record
SHEILA ANNE NICOLL Trustee 18 November 2018
JUST FINANCE FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
ST. PAUL'S CATHEDRAL
THE CHAPTERHOUSE
ST. PAUL'S CHURCHYARD
LONDON
EC4M 8AD
Phone:
02072468350