CREATIVE PULSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Creative Pulse runs Woolwich Creative Club, (WCC). The club provides free instrumental music lessons, band, poetry club and other creative activities for children aged 10-18 years old from Woolwich and surrounding areas. Creative Pulse is also able to provide other free creative programmes, projects and activities for children, young people and adults in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £9,900 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 March 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Steele | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Precious Jeffers | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Richard Reid | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Roger Wilson | Trustee |
|
||||||
Maria Ellen Taylor | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Richard Gray | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Jai Vishesh Manav Patel | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 February 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND PEOPLE WHO ARE IN SOCIALLY AND FINANCIALLY DISADVANTAGED CIRCUMSTANCES, BY PROVIDING THEM WITH INSTRUMENTAL MUSIC LESSONS AND OTHER MUSICAL, ARTISTIC AND CREATIVE OPPORTUNITIES FREE OF CHARGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tramshed
51-53 Woolwich New Road
London
SE18 6ES
- Phone:
- 07950495952
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window