Financial history YEALAND VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 521361
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 18/08/2020 18/08/2021 18/08/2022 18/08/2023 18/08/2024
Total gross income £18.78k £23.85k £12.05k £14.14k £14.26k
Total expenditure £17.91k £8.61k £10.81k £14.73k £21.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £19.00k £2.67k £250 N/A