YEALAND VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management and maintenance of Yealand Village Hall which is available to all people living in the local communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 18 August 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
34 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 05 May 1964: Standard registration
- THE YEALANDS CLUB (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geraldine Moore | Chair | 12 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Norton | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Mark Robinson | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Clair Wheeler-Stones | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mason-Cave | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gitane Collins | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Brown | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Oaks | Trustee | 23 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Kathryn Elizabeth Kenyon | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sue Tyldesley | Trustee | 05 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Dawn Maureen HANCOCK | Trustee | 12 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
LISA MARSHALL | Trustee | 12 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Helen Claire Sayers | Trustee | 11 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA MCCARTHY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 18/08/2020 | 18/08/2021 | 18/08/2022 | 18/08/2023 | 18/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.78k | £23.85k | £12.05k | £14.14k | £14.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.91k | £8.61k | £10.81k | £14.73k | £21.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £19.00k | £2.67k | £250 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 August 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 August 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 August 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 August 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 August 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 18TH SEPTEMBER 1963 AS VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 17 AUGUST 1993 AS AMENDED ON 27 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE YEALANDS AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
YEALANDS AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Storrs Grange
Silverdale Road
Yealand Redmayne
Carnforth
LA5 9TA
- Phone:
- 07769335107
- Email:
- gerrymoore1950@gmail.com
- Website:
-
yealandvillagehall.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window