SUSSEX PRISONERS' FAMILIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support family members of people who are facing imprisonment, imprisoned or leaving prison by offering advice, advocacy, information and emotional support; signposting to other appropriate organisations when appropriate and providing training, information and resources to professionals who work with prisoners' families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 16 June 2023: CIO registration
- SUSSEX PRISONERS' FAMILIES CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy Hart Leadsom | Chair | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Simmonds | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
MICHEL EMILE OLSZEWSKI | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Fiona Margaret Bauermeister | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £261.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £266.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF DEPENDENT FAMILY MEMBERS OF PEOPLE WHO ARE FACING IMPRISONMENT, IMPRISONED OR LEAVING PRISON, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH: A) HELPING THEM NAVIGATE THE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SYSTEM; B) OFFERING ADVICE, ADVOCACY, INFORMATION AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT; C) SIGNPOSTING TO OTHER APPROPRIATE ORGANISATIONS WHEN APPROPRIATE; D) PROVIDING INFORMATION AND RESOURCES TO PROFESSIONALS TO PROVIDE INSIGHT OF ISSUES FACED BY DEPENDENT FAMILY MEMBERS TO IMPROVE THE SUPPORT/SERVICES THEY PROVIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
39-41 SURREY STREET
BRIGHTON
BRIGHTON
BN1 3PB
- Phone:
- 01273499843
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window