THE BRADGATE PARK AND SWITHLAND WOOD CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To conserve, manage and maintain The Bradgate Park & Swithland Wood Country Park Estate - Leicestershire's Premier Country Park - for the enjoyment, education, recreation and appreciation of visitors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,310,200
Donations and legacies | £177.30k | |
Charitable activities | £1.95m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £166.04k | |
Other | £15.68k |
Total expenditure:
£2,114,066
Raising funds | £39.10k | |
Charitable activities | £2.07m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £130,171 from 6 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £39.10k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.07m | |
Retained for future use | £196.13k |
People

62 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
208 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 30 July 1963: Standard registration
- BRADGATE COUNTRY PARK (Working name)
- BRADGATE PARK & SWITHLAND WOOD COUNTRY PARK ESTATE INCLUDING LEICESTERSHIRE YEOMANRY WAR MEMORIAL (Working name)
- BRADGATE PARK AND SWITCHLAND WOOD COUNTRY PARK INC (Working name)
- BRADGATE PARK AND SWITHLAND WOOD COUNTRY PARK INCL LEICS YEOMANRY WAR MEMORIAL (Working name)
- BRADGATE PARK TRUST (Working name)
- BRADGATE PARK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS JAMES RUSHTON | Chair | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simone Hines | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elly Cutkelvin | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Bittner | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sean Atterbury | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Ransberry | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Sam Marcus Lattaway | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Taylor | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.67m | £1.86m | £1.84m | £2.00m | £2.31m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.70m | £1.43m | £1.60m | £1.67m | £2.11m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £237.14k | £268.85k | £180.79k | £129.65k | £130.17k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £99.23k | £151.18k | £142.48k | £166.65k | £177.30k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.49m | £1.63m | £1.56m | £1.67m | £1.95m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £76.25k | £76.83k | £106.45k | £137.27k | £166.04k | |
|
Income - Other | £4.80k | £4.89k | £25.90k | £31.20k | £15.68k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £50.00k | £0 | £0 | £153.30k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.70m | £1.43m | £1.57m | £1.67m | £2.07m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £30.25k | £0 | £39.10k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £19.63k | £3.12k | £6.24k | £6.41k | £6.81k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £601.62k | £571.13k | £643.08k | £735.04k | £776.35k | |
|
Long-term investments | £510.00k | £510.00k | £275.00k | £275.00k | £379.00k | |
|
Other assets | £341.38k | £804.82k | £1.23m | £1.53m | £1.86m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£622.00k | -£853.00k | -£582.00k | £73.00k | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £95.78k | £107.31k | £112.56k | £172.68k | £161.81k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 04 SEP 1980 AS AMENDED ON 08 DEC 2008 AS AMENDED ON 08 SEP 2014 AS AMENDED ON 19 JAN 2018 AS AMENDED ON 28 SEP 2020 as amended on 10 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
A) THE PROVISION OF A PUBLIC PARK AND RECREATION GROUND AND THE MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT THEREOF FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE COUNTY OF LEICESTERSHIRE AND OF VISITORS THERETO, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS AND B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CARE AND APPRECIATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE SCHEME).
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF LEICESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
ESTATE OFFICE
DEER BARN BUILDINGS
BRADGATE PARK
NEWTOWN LINFORD
LEICESTER
LE6 0HE
- Phone:
- 01162362713
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window