THE LIBERTY KITCHEN PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support and assistance to prisoners, ex-prisoners and individuals who may be in prison but have not yet been convicted and / or sentenced to help their rehabilitation, transition and integration into society during the period prior to and following their release from prison and to seek to reduce the risk of offending or re-offending (as applicable) following their release.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Camden
- City Of London
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Islington
- Kent
- Surrey
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORD CHARLES LESLIE FALCONER PC QC | Chair | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Hassan Ali | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Watts | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Killick | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
CATRIONA FOX | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Denis Philip King | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Barnes | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lord Edward Peter Lawless Faulks KC | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31 MAR 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 OCT 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO PRISONERS, EX-PRISONERS AND INDIVIDUALS WHO MAY BE IN PRISON BUT HAVE NOT YET BEEN CONVICTED AND / OR SENTENCED TO HELP THEIR REHABILITATION, TRANSITION AND INTEGRATION INTO SOCIETY DURING THE PERIOD PRIOR TO AND FOLLOWING THEIR RELEASE FROM PRISON AND TO SEEK TO REDUCE THE RISK OF OFFENDING OR RE-OFFENDING (AS APPLICABLE) FOLLOWING THEIR RELEASE, IN PARTICULAR BY ENGAGING IN SUCH ACTIVITIES AS CONSIDERED FIT IN FURTHERANCE OF SUCH OBJECTIVES INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) THROUGH: (A) PROVISION OF SKILLS TRAINING, EDUCATION AND CAPACITY BUILDING TO MAXIMISE OPPORTUNITIES TO SECURE EMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY BY ASSISTING REINTEGRATION INTO SOCIETY; (B) COLLABORATION AND CO-OPERATION WITH THE PRISON SERVICE OR ASSOCIATED ENTITIES AND ORGANISATIONS AS CONSIDERED FIT SO THAT THE RELEVANT INDIVIDUALS ARE BETTER ABLE TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY FOLLOWING RELEASE FROM PRISON; AND (C) SUPPORT FOR PRISONERS ON RELEASE TO HELP THEM DEEPEN LIFE AND EMPLOYMENT SKILLS THROUGH JOB OPPORTUNITIES (AIDING REINTEGRATION)
Contact information
- Address:
-
34B YORK WAY
LONDON
N1 9AB
- Phone:
- 07795563309
- Email:
- janet@libertykitchen.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window