Trustees READ EASY DERBY & DISTRICT
Charity number: 1202775

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Duncan John Livsey | Chair | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Styles | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Marie Sturman | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amina Rashid | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Elisabeth Courtney | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Ruth Anne Hodgson | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jill Smith | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
JILL DOREEN REED | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
AMY LOUISE BRISTOW | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER FIONA HENLEY | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.