THE DEMENTIA CARE HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
At The Dementia Care Hub CIO, we offer a programme of sessions to support care partners and people living with a dementia in Hampshire. We provide groups to reduce isolation and loneliness, training for care partners, wellbeing sessions for people living with dementia, respite, art groups and carer groups. We develop social care plans to support people the right support at the right time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
Total income includes £4,894 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 03 August 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon W Brimble | Chair | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Martin Glover | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Allan | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Chaabane | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Margaret Hodge | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Sarah Roberts | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PERSONS LIVING WITH A DEMENTIA, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, BY PROVIDING SUPPORT, TRAINING, AND GUIDANCE AND BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RESPITE AND RECREATION IN A SAFE AND STIMULATING ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Southcote
Southampton Road
Cadnam
Hampshire
SO40 2NF
- Phone:
- 07769009599
- Email:
- info@dementiacarehub.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window