THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF CHRIST, BLESSED MARY THE VIRGIN AND ST CUTHBERT OF DURHAM

Charity number: 1205971
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Durham Cathedral is the Anglican Cathedral Church of the Diocese of Durham. It is the Shrine of St Cuthbert and the Venerable Bede, the Seat of the Bishop of Durham and a focus of pilgrimage and spirituality in North East England. Inspired by our saints, Cuthbert and Bede, the mission of Durham Cathedral is to offer everyone the opportunity to encounter God and know God's love in Jesus Christ.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Durham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 April 2024: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DURHAM CATHEDRAL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Canon Alice Ambrose-Thurman Trustee 22 January 2025
None on record
Canon Dr Maria Cockerill Trustee 07 October 2024
None on record
Canon Paul Chandler Trustee 07 October 2024
CBF FUNDS TRUSTEE LIMITED
Received: On time
The Revd Canon Michael Everitt Trustee 07 October 2024
FRIENDS OF DURHAM CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
Canon Jonathan Ward Trustee 07 October 2024
None on record
The Revd Canon Charlotte Allen Trustee 07 October 2024
None on record
The Revd Canon Michael Hampel Trustee 07 October 2024
None on record
The Revd Canon Professor Simon Oliver Trustee 07 October 2024
None on record
THE VERY REVD PHILIP PLYMING Trustee 07 October 2024
None on record
Canon Professor Stefanie Constanze Sheen Trustee 06 October 2024
None on record
Canon Dr Apollo Tutesigensi Trustee 06 October 2024
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 20 JUN 1995 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 27 JUN 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ACADEMIC LIFE OF ORDAINED CLERGY IN THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND OR CHURCHES IN COMMUNION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND OR OTHER CHURCHES TO WHICH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND (ECUMENICAL RELATIONS) MEASURE 1988 FOR THE TIME BEING APPLIES BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) TO PROMOTE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF AND TO SUPPORT (WHETHER OR NOT THE CHARITY HAS PROMOTED IT) ON SUCH TERMS AS THE TRUSTEE THINKS FIT A RESEARCH POST IN CHRISTIAN THEOLOGY IN THE UNIVERSITY OF DURHAM IN CONJUNCTION WITH A RESIDENTIARY OR LAY CANONRY IN DURHAM CATHEDRAL SO FAR AS THE CATHEDRAL?S STATUTES FROM TIME TO TIME PERMIT, OR (B) TO PROMOTE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF AND TO SUPPORT (WHETHER OR NOT THE CHARITY HAS PROMOTED THEM) ON SUCH TERMS AS THE TRUSTEE THINKS FIT ONE OR MORE PROFESSORSHIPS IN THE THEOLOGY DEPARTMENT OF THE UNIVERSITY OF DURHAM IN CONJUNCTION WITH RESIDENTIARY OR LAY CANONRIES IN DURHAM CATHEDRAL, OR (C) FAILING THE ABOVE TO PROMOTE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF AND TO SUPPORT (WHETHER OR NOT THE CHARITY HAS PROMOTED THEM) ON SUCH TERMS AS THE TRUSTEE THINKS FIT SIMILAR POSTS IN OTHER UNIVERSITIES IN CONJUNCTION WITH RESIDENTIARY OR LAY CANONRIES IN DURHAM CATHEDRAL.
Area of benefit
Registration history
  • 25 April 2024 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
DURHAM CATHEDRAL
THE CATHEDRAL OFFICE
THE COLLEGE
DURHAM
DH1 3EH
Phone:
01913755255