THE WINCHESTER LIDO SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 14 April 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Francis David Burgess | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Joan Jarrett | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Mark Andrew Wheadon | Trustee |
|
||||||
Alan Wall | Trustee |
|
||||||
Rosemary Anne MacMahon Burns | Trustee |
|
||||||
Gary Peter Sorensen | Trustee |
|
||||||
Callum Wright | Trustee |
|
||||||
Nigel Charles Smith | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 13 May 2025 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 13 May 2025 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROVIDE PUBLIC FACILITIES FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF WINCHESTER, HAMPSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO, FACILITIES FOR BADMINTON, JUDO AND MARTIAL ARTS, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WINCHESTER LIDO SPORTS ASSOCIATION
HYDE CHURCH LANE
WINCHESTER
SO23 7DZ
- Phone:
- 01962854802
- Email:
- winchesterlido@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window