3RD WARRINGTON (1ST CULCHETH) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scout Group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Warrington
Governance
- 08 May 1964: Standard registration
- 3RD WARRINGTON (1ST NEWCHURCH) BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Bennett | Chair | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Gare | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Geoff Clarke | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Liane Clarke | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Caswell | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Simpson-Forrest | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.16k | £21.68k | £17.65k | £9.21k | £14.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.79k | £9.97k | £8.36k | £20.00k | £21.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.67k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
AGREEMENT DATED 26TH SEPTEMBER 1958
Charitable objects
3RD WARRINGTON (1ST NEWCHURCH) BOY SCOUT GROUP.
Area of benefit
WARRINGTON AND DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CULCHETH SCOUT CENTRE
JACKSON AVENUE
CULCHETH
WARRINGTON
CHESHIRE
WA3 4EJ
- Phone:
- 01925763443
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window