CANTERBURY CATHEDRAL

Charity number: 1206913
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious Activities

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 February 2024: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE CATHEDRAL AND METROPOLITICAL CHURCH OF CHRIST, CANTERBURY (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr David Monteith Very Rev Chair 17 December 2022
JESUS HOSPITAL
Received: On time
Catherine Jane Ibbotson Trustee 28 January 2024
KENT WILDLIFE TRUST
Received: On time
Paul John Sylva FCG FCA Trustee 27 January 2024
None on record
PERRICONE GUY Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
PAMELA JANE BAXTER Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
The Venerable William Jonathan Adam Trustee 01 July 2022
JESUS HOSPITAL
Received: On time
KENT WORKPLACE MISSION
Received: On time
The Social Justice Network
Received: On time
ST AUGUSTINE'S FOUNDATION
Received: On time
CANTERBURY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE ANGLICAN CENTRE IN ROME
Received: On time
EASTBRIDGE HOSPITAL
Received: On time
THE KING'S SCHOOL OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF CANTERBURY
Received: On time
Reverend Canon Emma Pennington Trustee 01 March 2022
None on record
Reverend Canon Andrew Dodd Trustee 01 June 2020
None on record
Reverend Canon Timothy Naish Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
CANTERBURY CATHEDRAL
CATHEDRAL HOUSE
THE PRECINCTS
CANTERBURY
KENT
CT1 2EH
Phone:
01227762862