Financial history 1ST IBSTOCK BOY SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 521731
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £12.43k £12.08k £6.52k £6.80k £12.32k
Total expenditure £5.87k £10.19k £5.21k £7.80k £6.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A