THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF EXPORT & INTERNATIONAL TRADE

Charity number: 1206688
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 January 2024: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • IOE&IT (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sean Ramsden Trustee 30 January 2025
INSTITUTE OF EXPORT AND INTERNATIONAL TRADE (THE)
Received: On time
Jale Cairney Trustee 03 December 2024
INSTITUTE OF EXPORT AND INTERNATIONAL TRADE (THE)
Received: On time
Scott Parker Trustee 03 December 2024
INSTITUTE OF EXPORT AND INTERNATIONAL TRADE (THE)
Received: On time
Jayakumar Venkataraman Trustee 29 March 2023
None on record
FILOMENA TEIXEIRA Trustee 29 March 2023
INSTITUTE OF EXPORT AND INTERNATIONAL TRADE (THE)
Received: On time
John Henry Myers Alty Trustee 08 September 2022
INSTITUTE OF EXPORT AND INTERNATIONAL TRADE (THE)
Received: On time
Caroline Olive Mary Gumble Trustee 21 November 2019
INSTITUTE OF EXPORT AND INTERNATIONAL TRADE (THE)
Received: On time
CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF BUILDING BENEVOLENT FUND LIMITED
Prof Sangeeta Khorana Trustee 21 November 2019
INSTITUTE OF EXPORT AND INTERNATIONAL TRADE (THE)
Received: On time
Dominic James Haworth Broom Trustee 01 August 2019
INSTITUTE OF EXPORT AND INTERNATIONAL TRADE (THE)
Received: On time
Stephen McQuillan Trustee 29 January 2019
INSTITUTE OF EXPORT AND INTERNATIONAL TRADE (THE)
Received: On time
Terence Charles William Scuoler CBE MIEx Trustee 08 November 2017
INSTITUTE OF EXPORT AND INTERNATIONAL TRADE (THE)
Received: On time
MARCEL HUGO LANDAU Trustee 06 November 2014
THE IOE FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
IOE&IT
EXPORT HOUSE
MINERVA BUSINESS PARK
LYNCH WOOD
PETERBOROUGH
PE2 6FT
Phone:
01733404400