CREATED: CHURCH

Charity number: 1204123
Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £221,338
Total expenditure: £22,977

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 July 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
AARON CHAUDHARY Trustee 16 June 2023
THE DAVID CHAUDHARY MINISTRIES CHILDRENS HOME TRUST
Received: 69 days late
THE DAVID CHAUDHARY MINISTRIES FUND
Received: 69 days late
AARON CHAUDHARY MINISTRIES
Received: 41 days late
TREVOR PINDER Trustee
AARON CHAUDHARY MINISTRIES
Received: 41 days late
Barry Paul Cross Trustee
RELENTLESS CHURCH, WARRINGTON
Received: On time
THE WORKINGMEN'S MISSION BANK QUAY
Received: On time
Penny Heather Pinder Trustee
None on record
David Frederick Jarvis Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2024
Total gross income £221.34k
Total expenditure £22.98k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 10 April 2025 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 10 April 2025 41 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PO BOX 65
NEWTON AYCLIFFE
DL5 7YR
Phone:
07572242417