CURBOROUGH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Community Association which provides low cost accommodation for voluntary sector groups to have meetings and provide services.
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 22 August 2023: CIO registration
- 28 January 2025: Funds received from 1077306 CURBOROUGH (LICHFIELD) COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paula Ann Knight | Chair | 13 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Anne Margaret Pitman | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Lilas Rawling | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|||||||
Sientje Sherry | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Mark White | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Ed Strain | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Colin Ball | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Jude Killip | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Harrison | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Colin Booker | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 22 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CITY OF LICHFIELD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY BOUNDARIES OF THE CIVIL PARISH (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BR DETERMINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CURBOROUGH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
CURBOROUGH COMMUNITY CENTRE
REYNOLDS CLOSE
LICHFIELD
WS13 7NY
- Phone:
- 01543417149
- Email:
- manager@curborough.community
- Website:
-
curborough.community
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.