STUBTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 521870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Running and operating Stubton Village Hall for the benefit of the general public.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £20,203
Total expenditure: £25,392

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 April 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Catherine Senior Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Martin John Davis Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Julie Bratton Trustee 09 June 2021
None on record
IAN PHILLIPS Trustee 09 June 2021
THE NEWARK AREA ARTS AND LEISURE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BEAUMOND HOUSE COMMUNITY HOSPICE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.63k £17.71k £11.92k £29.16k £20.20k
Total expenditure £25.71k £3.44k £6.87k £40.12k £25.39k
Income from government contracts £690 N/A N/A N/A £300
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £7.00k £10.38k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 February 2024 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 14 February 2024 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Stubton Village Hall
Fenton Road
Stubton
NEWARK
Nottinghamshire
NG23 5DB
Phone:
07831604588
Website:

No information available