THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF SAINT MARY AND SAINT CHAD IN LICHFIELD

Charity Number: 1207343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Lichfield Cathedral is a historic place of worship. The Cathedral operates 3 services a day Monday - Saturday and 5 services on a Sunday. In addition to the worship, the Cathedral is a visitor attraction, events and exhibition venue, operates educational activity, and is landlord to 70 properties in a private Cathedral Close.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire
  • Staffordshire
  • Wolverhampton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 March 2024: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • LICHFIELD CATHEDRAL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rt Revd Janet McFarlane Chair 05 July 2020
THE LICHFIELD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
LLOYD COOKE Trustee 02 March 2025
THE POTTER'S HOUSE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
STOKE ON TRENT MISSION CIRCUIT
Received: 4 days late
Eric Lunt Trustee 02 March 2025
None on record
Mo Trudel Trustee 02 March 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LONGTON HALL
Recently registered
The Revd Canon Dr The Revd Canon Dr Gregory Platten Trustee 05 July 2020
None on record
Ann Fisher Trustee 02 March 2019
None on record
THE REVEREND PETER HOLLIDAY BCOMMAFCA Trustee 02 March 2019
None on record
Peter Sharpe MBE Trustee 07 September 2017
None on record
the Revd Canon Andrew Stead Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2024
Total gross income £3.28m
Total expenditure £3.43m
Income from government contracts £10.72k
Income from government grants £164.33k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.48m
Income - Other trading activities £821.72k
Income - Charitable activities £42.53k
Income - Endowments £50.53k
Income - Investment £929.28k
Income - Other £0
Income - Legacies £155.18k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.13m
Expenditure - Governance £3.95k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.91k
Expenditure - Investment management £4.88k
Expenditure - Other £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2024
Own use assets £8.05m
Long-term investments £24.87m
Other assets £4.44m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0
Total liabilities £457.83k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 29 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 29 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Lichfield Cathedral Office
19A The Close
Lichfield
WS13 7LD
Phone:
01543306100
Website:

No information available