THE ELLA DAWSON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1204154
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Ella Dawson Foundation was initially registered with the Charities Commission in December 2021 as a Charitable Trust Deed (Charity No 1197112). The charity aims to help young adults aged 18-30 years old living in the UK and their families and carers to live well through and beyond a cancer diagnosis by providing tailored physical, psychological, nutritional and wellbeing support.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 July 2023: CIO registration
  • 26 July 2024: Funds received from 1197112 THE ELLA DAWSON FOUNDATION
  • 08 October 2024: Funds received from 501416 ROTARY CLUB OF HUDDERSFIELD TRUST FUND
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Dawson Chair 28 July 2023
None on record
Kris Holland Trustee 19 December 2024
None on record
James Hales Trustee 05 December 2024
None on record
Natasha Dawson Trustee 28 July 2023
None on record
Connor Gamble Trustee 28 July 2023
None on record
Hanna Simpson Trustee 28 July 2023
SMILEY SMILEY JOSH RILEY FOUNDATION
Received: 3 days late
Kevin Dawson Trustee 28 July 2023
None on record
Laura Riach Trustee 28 July 2023
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
The Art Studio, 3 DELVES MOOR
CHAIN ROAD
SLAITHWAITE
HD7 5TY
Phone:
07418 613885