BLAST - BURNTWOOD AND LICHFIELD AUTISM SUPPORT TOGETHER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BLAST provides support for autistic children and young people and their families in Staffordshire through safe learning environments, workshops, and leisure activities. We promote social inclusion by raising public awareness, providing advocacy, and enabling autistic children and families to be part of their community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 09 June 2023: CIO registration
- BLAST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rehana Begum Ali | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Neil Hartley Walduck | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jillian Colette Hart-Sanderson | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Tew | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OVER THE AGE OF 10 IN STAFFORDSHIRE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF AUTISM, RELIEVING THEIR NEEDS AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING INFORMATION AND LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES IN A SAFE, ACCESSIBLE ENVIRONMENT DESIGNED TO SUPPORT AND ENABLE AUTISTIC CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE TO MAXIMISE THEIR DEVELOPMENT AND POTENTIAL; B) RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS AND PROMOTING UNDERSTANDING OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING AUTISTIC CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES, BOTH GENERALLY AND IN RELATION TO THEIR SOCIAL EXCLUSION, AND ADDRESSING THE CHALLENGES THEY FACE BY SHARING KNOWLEDGE AND EXPERIENCES; C) PROVIDING WORKSHOPS, FORUMS, ADVOCACY AND GENERAL SUPPORT DESIGNED TO PROMOTE THE INVOLVEMENT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH AUTISM AND THEIR FAMILIES IN THE RUNNING OF THEIR GROUP, IN THEIR COMMUNITY, AND IN SOCIETY; D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES FOR AUTISTIC CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES/PEOPLE WHO SUPPORT THEM PROVIDED IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BLAST 36 Princess Street
Burntwood
Staffordshire
WS7 1JN
- Phone:
- 07773794992
- Email:
- blast.staffs@gmail.com
- Website:
-
blastsupport.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window