THE PARISH OF REDRUTH

Charity number: 1204231
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Parochial Church Council which administers and is responsible for 5 churches at St Andrew Redruth, St Euny Redruth, St Stephen Treleigh, Christchurch Lanner and St Andrew Pencoys

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 August 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • REDRUTH PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Rebecca Mary Bell Chair 02 September 2024
None on record
Christine Ann Cunningham Trustee 27 April 2025
None on record
Ronald Michael Pitcher Trustee 17 March 2024
None on record
Patricia Mary Knights Trustee 17 March 2024
None on record
Michael Louis Smith Trustee 17 March 2024
None on record
JULIET MARY JENKIN Trustee 17 March 2024
GUILD OF FRIENDS OF CAMBORNE-REDRUTH COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Received: On time
Robert Charles Knights Trustee 17 March 2024
None on record
Mary Alison Anson Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Linda Elizabeth James Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Mary Eileen Harris Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Margaret Anne Youlton Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Caroline Maria Stewart Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Brian Gannaway Trustee 07 August 2023
None on record
Jason Hoole-Jackson Trustee 07 August 2023
None on record
Lucie Rogers Trustee 07 August 2023
None on record
Jill Tolputt Trustee 07 August 2023
None on record
Lez Seth Trustee 07 August 2023
None on record
Jeff Saville Trustee 07 August 2023
None on record
Sheila Gannaway Trustee 07 August 2023
None on record
Richard John Arundell ROBINSON Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Linda Beskeen Trustee 23 April 2023
REDRUTH OLD CORNWALL SOCIETY
Charity reporting is overdue by 670 days
ROYAL GEOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF CORNWALL
Received: On time

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
St. Andrews Church
Clinton Road
REDRUTH
TR15 2LL
Phone:
01209200739