Financial history SIBSEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 521987
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £11.45k £5.95k £30.02k £49.91k £52.04k
Total expenditure £18.10k £14.02k £31.87k £47.93k £42.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A £2.67k N/A N/A