SIBSEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a building and facilities for the local community and other hirers to use to hold regular / occasional events. Provide a building and facilities for the Village Hall Committee to use for small and large fundraising activities for the upkeep and running of the hall itself, as well as contributing to the village as a whole.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 08 January 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ben Pickwell-Smart | Chair | 03 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Stapleton | Trustee | 10 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Leonard | Trustee | 10 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alex Bell | Trustee | 10 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Burrell | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Hodgson | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ross Pickwell-Smart | Trustee | 03 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Leak | Trustee | 31 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANN STUBLEY | Trustee | 31 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Hodgson | Trustee | 31 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alison Rockall | Trustee | 31 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN PALMER | Trustee | 27 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
SIMON DAVID SPENS | Trustee | 29 March 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.45k | £5.95k | £30.02k | £49.91k | £52.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.10k | £14.02k | £31.87k | £47.93k | £42.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 18TH OCTOBER 1960
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SIBSEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 ST. MARGARETS DRIVE
SIBSEY
BOSTON
PE22 0ST
- Phone:
- 01205750202
- Email:
- annstubley@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
sibseyvillagehall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window