WELTON VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WVHT provides building for various charity/organisations to use for leisure - pleasure - sport - recreation and provide amenities for hire etc. We operate through a management/executive committee.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 31 October 1969: Standard registration
- WELTON VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Nicholls | Chair | 09 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Brian James North | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan John Maurice Evans | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Terry Peachman | Trustee | 09 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.43k | £27.27k | £34.85k | £45.69k | £39.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.25k | £17.86k | £28.45k | £31.59k | £38.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.00k | £10.67k | £2.85k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 31 DECEMBER 1951 CONVEYANCE 31 MARCH 1969
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WELTON AND THE IMMEDIATE VICINITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
59 EASTFIELD LANE
WELTON
LINCOLN
LN2 3ND
- Phone:
- 01673860454
- Email:
- helenandgraham@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window