SCARCROFT GOLF CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING GOLF OR OTHER AMATEUR SPORTS AT SCARCROFT GOLF CLUB
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leeds City
Governance
- 27 February 2024: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Davison | Trustee | 21 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laura Sayer | Trustee | 21 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Ineson | Trustee | 21 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Everial Peck Mrs | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HUGHES | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN JOHN HAYES | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|||||
John Malcolm Wharton Mr | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING GOLF OR OTHER AMATEUR SPORTS AT SCARCROFT GOLF CLUB.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SCARCROFT GOLF CLUB
SYKE LANE
SCARCROFT
LEEDS
LS14 3BQ
- Phone:
- 01132892311
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window