VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Responsible for the management and maintenance of a community building on behalf of the residents of Langley-On-Tyne and surrounding district. The building is hired out to individuals and organisations for a variety of educational, social and recreational activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northumberland
Governance
- 02 March 1964: Standard registration
- LANGLEY VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek Wilson | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Brownbridge | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Bates | Trustee | 25 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Kathleen Margaret Rutherford | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GAYLE ELIZABETH TAILFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAURA ANNE GILHESPY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.33k | £12.89k | £26.17k | £5.95k | £3.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.88k | £2.98k | £13.37k | £11.46k | £5.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £23.92k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 August 2024 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 18TH MAY 1954
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
LANGLEY ON TYNE AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
BEACON RIGG FARM
LANGLEY-ON-TYNE
HEXHAM
NE47 5LF
- Phone:
- 01434683365
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window