THE ROBERT ADAM ROME SCHOLARSHIP IN ARCHITECTURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 October 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Robert Adam | Chair |
|
||||||
Edgar Robin Allies | Trustee |
|
||||||
Mark Roland Wilson Jones MA Cantab, Dip Arch | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Hugh David Michael Petter BA(Hons), DIPL ARCH, RIBA, FRSA, MR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £185.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 June 2024 | 12 May 2025 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2024 | 12 May 2025 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF BRITISH AND COMMONWEALTH CITIZENS BY AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS A SCHOLARSHIP TENABLE AT THE BRITISH SCHOOL AT ROME OR SIMILARLY LOCATED INSTITUTION FOR AN ARCHITECT OR SCHOLAR TO STUDY THE TRADITION AND EVOLUTION OF CLASSICAL ARCHITECTURE IN ROME AND ITALY TOGETHER WITH OR CONCERNING ASSOCIATED URBAN FORM AND PROVIDE A RECORD OF THESE STUDIES WITH THE PURPOSE OF INFORMING CURRENT ARCHITECTURAL PRACTICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crooked Pightle House
Crawley
WINCHESTER
SO21 2PN
- Phone:
- 01962776480
- Email:
- ra@robertadamarchitect.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window