CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF SAINT PETER AND SAINT PAUL IN SHEFFIELD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Doncaster
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 12 April 2024: Standard registration
- SHEFFIELD CATHEDRAL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Very Revd Abigail Laura Thompson | Chair | 06 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Howard Neil Riley | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|||||
REVEREND JULIE UPTON | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA MARY REES | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||
PAMELA EDWARDS LIVERSIDGE OBE | Trustee | 11 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Canon Charles Arnol John Biggin | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Sally Louise Holding | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV'D JUSTIN DAVID CAMPBELL DODD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 DECEMBER 2023 IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CATHEDRALS MEASURE 2021
Charitable objects
1. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHAPTER ARE: (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FAITH AND PRACTICE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, IN PARTICULAR BY FURTHERING THE MISSION OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND; (B) TO CARE FOR AND CONSERVE THE FABRIC AND STRUCTURE OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH BUILDING; (C) TO ADVANCE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE ANCILLARY TO THE FURTHERANCE OF THE PURPOSE REFERRED TO IN SUB-PARAGRAPH (A) OR (B). 2. IN PARAGRAPH (1): THE MISSION OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND? MEANS THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL; CATHEDRAL CHURCH BUILDING? MEANS THE BUILDINGS WITHIN THE ECCLESIASTICAL EXEMPTION FOR THE CATHEDRAL; CHARITABLE PURPOSES? MEANS PURPOSES WITHIN SECTION 2(1) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2011. 3. IN FURTHERING THE OBJECTS SET OUT IN PARAGRAPH (1), THE CHAPTER MUST ACT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITHIN THE MEANING OF SECTION 4(3) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2011
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHEFFIELD CATHEDRAL
CHURCH STREET
SHEFFIELD
S1 1HA
- Phone:
- 01142753434
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.