THE RAMPHAL INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Ramphal Institute works to advance education for the benefit of the public, including policy makers, in the fields of social, economic, governance and environmental policies within the commonwealth, by means of analysis, studies, meeting, lectures, conferences, seminars, workshops, research and the dissemination of the useful results of the foregoing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Australia
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belize
- Botswana
- Canada
- Eswatini
- Fiji
- Ghana
- Guyana
- India
- Jamaica
- Kenya
- Kiribati
- Malaysia
- Malta
- Mauritius
- Papua New Guinea
- Samoa
- Scotland
- Seychelles
- Singapore
- South Africa
- The Bahamas
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Uganda
Governance
- 23 November 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kamela Palma | Chair | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Akinyi Eurallyah | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Winnie Anna Kiap | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anita Nzeh | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Meenakshi Dhar | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Cutts | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ajay Kumar Agrawal | Trustee | 06 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
Richard Evans | Trustee | 06 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARK ROBINSON | Trustee | 01 May 2007 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £728 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE RAMPHAL INSTITUTE ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC INCLUDING POLICY MAKERS IN THE FIELDS OF SOCIAL, ECONOMIC, GOVERNANCE AND ENVIRONMENTAL POLICIES WITHIN THE COMMONWEALTH, BY MEANS OF ANALYSIS STUDIES, MEETINGS, LECTURES, CONFERENCES, SEMINARS, WORKSHOPS, RESEARCH AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THE FOREGOING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woburn House
5th Floor
20-24 Tavistock Square
London
London
- Phone:
- 07484822463
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window