THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY OF LINCOLN

Charity number: 1207411
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Cathedral Church of the Blessed Virgin Mary of Lincoln ('Lincoln Cathedral') is first and foremost a church, the seat of the Bishop of Lincoln and a centre of worship and mission.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire
  • North East Lincolnshire
  • North Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 March 2024: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Amy Livingstone-Thompson Trustee 13 March 2025
None on record
Hilary Jane Hamnet Trustee 13 March 2025
None on record
Martin James Hickerton Trustee 13 March 2025
None on record
Neil Rhodes Trustee 13 March 2025
None on record
Andrew Edward Long Trustee 13 March 2025
None on record
The Very Revd Dr Simon Matthew Jones Trustee 14 September 2024
LINCOLN CATHEDRAL MUSIC FUND
Received: On time
LINCOLN CATHEDRAL LEARNING, ARTS, CULTURE AND EVENTS CIO
Received: On time
THE LINCOLN DIOCESAN TRUST AND BOARD OF FINANCE LTD
Received: On time
Rev CAROLYN BAILEY Trustee 09 July 2024
ANNE FISHERS CHARITY
Received: On time
RACHEL HYDE AND THE REVEREND JOHN MOSSOP (EXCLUSIVE OF THE HYDE PRIZES AND REWARDS)
Received: On time
RICHARD SEATON NORTON
Received: On time
CHARITY OF MARY PRICE
Received: On time
CHARITY OF GEORGE SNEATH
Received: On time
WILLIAM IRELAND'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THURLBY CAUSEWAY ESTATE CHARITY
Received: On time
Mark Andrew Everett Suthern Trustee 12 March 2024
THE INSTITUTE OF AGRICULTURAL MANAGEMENT CIO
Recently registered
Nigel Stuart Welch Trustee 12 March 2024
None on record
THE REVD CANON ROWENA NIESJE KING Trustee 12 March 2024
None on record
Simon Keith Parkes Trustee 12 March 2024
None on record
Revd Canon Nicholas James Watson Brown Trustee 20 December 2020
THE HOSPITAL OF THE HOLY AND UNDIVIDED TRINITY
Received: On time
JOHN DARELL FOR SCHOLARSHIP AT EXETER COLLEGE, OXFORD
Received: On time
LINCOLN DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
Received: On time
Amanda Jane Dowdy Trustee 20 December 2020
ST.PETER'S SCHOOL, YORK
Received: On time

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
Lincoln Cathedral
4 Priorygate
LINCOLN
LN2 1PL
Phone:
01522561600