YESOID CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth activities in Greater Manchester.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Salford City
Governance
- 15 November 2023: CIO registration
- YESOID (Working name)
- YESIOD CIO (Previous name)
- YESOID (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy Rose | Chair | 15 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Mathew Ryan Kanter | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philipp Chaim Berkovits | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
ADAM SALOMON | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
TO HELP JEWISH YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
79A Windsor Road
Prestwich
MANCHESTER
M25 0DB
- Phone:
- 07706190303
- Email:
- info@yesoid.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window