DEVON & CORNWALL TRAINING PROVIDERS NETWORK LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides impartial advice, signposting & guidance around post-16 skills & training to the general public & other relevant external agencies such as DWP/ Job Centre Plus, care agencies, schools, colleges, business owners, employers, young people, their parents and carers & the wider community. The charity also provides practical support to those engaged in post-16 education/training.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Plymouth City
- Torbay
Governance
- 12 March 2024: Standard registration
- 29 August 2024: Funds received from 290878 EDUCATION AND TRAINING SKILLS LTD
- DCTPN (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARIA WOODGER | Chair | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Fanshawe | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Trewin | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Rendle | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Fiona Horrell | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Hallam | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE SKEEL | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
GARETH JAMES KENWARD | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 OCT 2005 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 05 SEP 2023 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 SEP 2023
Charitable objects
1.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PEOPLE IN DEVON AND CORNWALL ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT"), IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) BRINGING TOGETHER WORK-BASED LEARNING, VOCATIONAL AND TECHNICAL TRAINING PROVIDERS TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE COLLABORATION IN SUPPORT OF WORK-BASED LEARNING AND VOCATIONAL AND TECHNICAL TRAINING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; (B) DEVELOPING QUALITY IN-WORK BASED AND WORK-RELATED LEARNING PROVISION THROUGH THE DEVELOPMENT OF CONSISTENT APPROACHES AND THE SHARING OF GOOD PRACTICE IN THE DELIVERY OF TRAINING; (C) WORKING WITH KEY PARTNERS AND STAKEHOLDERS TO PROMOTE AND IMPROVE WORK-BASED LEARNING, VOCATIONAL AND TECHNICAL TRAINING PROVISION; (D) DEVELOPING AND PRODUCING MATERIALS AND RESOURCES TO SUPPORT EFFECTIVE AND IMPARTIAL SIGNPOSTING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE TO POST-16 WORK-BASED LEARNING, VOCATIONAL AND TECHNICAL TRAINING OPTIONS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; AND (E) PROMOTING GREATER AWARENESS OF POST-16 TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, INCLUDING THOSE THAT ARE CARE-EXPERIENCED AND/OR HAVE AN EDUCATION HEALTH CARE PLAN (EHCP) AND/OR THOSE WITH SEND - SPECIAL EDUCATION NEEDS & DISABILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O BROMHEAD CHARTERED ACCOUNTANTS
HARSCOMBE HOUSE
1 DARKLAKE VIEW
ESTOVER
PLYMOUTH
PL6 7TL
- Phone:
- 01752294187
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.