GREAT MINDS BRIGHT FUTURES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Great Minds Bright Futures supports orphaned and vulnerable children in Malawi and Uganda by providing education, food, clothing, healthcare and activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Malawi
- Uganda
Governance
- 17 January 2024: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Armstrong | Chair | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW STATON | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jasmine Tanja Sau | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Agatha Phiri | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Richard Pratt | Trustee | 14 August 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 SEP 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13 JAN 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO: (A) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY ORPHANS, IN AFRICA (IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY MALAWI AND UGANDA) BY (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING): (I) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (II) PROVIDING GRANTS, GOODS, FACILITIES AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE PARTICULARLY ORPHANS, IN AFRICA. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY ORPHANS, IN AFRICA (IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY MALAWI AND UGANDA) BY (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING): (I) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES; (II) THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION IN HEALTH MATTERS WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR HEALTHCARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hamill House
112a-116 Chorley New Road
Bolton
BL1 4DH
- Phone:
- 01204 498 040
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window