SOLENT MALE VOICE CHOIR
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Male Voice Choir singing for fun each Tuesday and at various events throughout the year
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- West Sussex
Governance
- 26 October 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David William McVittie | Chair | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Arthur Rampton | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert George Crutchley | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Brian Thomas | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ANDREW BUTCHER | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 OCT 2023
Charitable objects
(1) THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN THE MALE VOICE CHOIR TRADITION IN ORDER TO FOSTER A GREATER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCES. (2) TO ASSIST AND SUPPORT SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Pagham Close
Emsworth
PO10 8JB
- Phone:
- 07958711291
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.